NY S02303 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 2303A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 2303A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the state sales tax on wireless telephone services and provides for a local option of imposing such taxes.
Title
Removes the state sales tax on wireless telephone services and provides for a local option of imposing such taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2303A |
2014-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04956 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - print number 4956a