NY S02264 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure by crisis pregnancy centers to clients that such center will not provide abortion or birth control services or make a referral for such services, and that such center is not a licensed medical provider; such notice shall be conducted upon first communication or first contact with the client and shall be either in a written statement or oral communication by staff assisting the client.
Title
Requires disclosure by crisis pregnancy centers to clients that such center will not provide abortion or birth control services or make a referral for such services, and that such center is not a licensed medical provider; such notice shall be conducted upon first communication or first contact with the client and shall be either in a written statement or oral communication by staff assisting the client.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.458 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A02352 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health