NY S02239 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2239A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2239A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "electric super highway act of 2018", requiring alternative fuels to be available for public use along the New York state thruway after November 1, 2018 and providing each recommended alternative fuel at least every one hundred twenty miles on both sides of the thruway; defines "alternative fuel".
Title
Enacts the "electric super highway act of 2018", requiring alternative fuels to be available for public use along the New York state thruway after November 1, 2018 and providing each recommended alternative fuel at least every one hundred twenty miles on both sides of the thruway; defines "alternative fuel".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2239A |
2018-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02522 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - print number 2522a