NY S02173 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sex offenders to verify their residence and registration on a biannual basis; provides that the division shall mail a verification form to each registered sex offender on a different random date during each six month period of the calendar year.
Title
Requires sex offenders to verify their residence and registration on a biannual basis; provides that the division shall mail a verification form to each registered sex offender on a different random date during each six month period of the calendar year.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1057 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1539 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08719 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - held for consideration in correction