NY S02173 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities official functions.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities official functions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.473 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.973 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |