NY S02173 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds "park grounds and playgrounds" to statute currently providing increased penalties for sale of controlled substances to certain persons if such sale occurs on or within 1,000 feet of school grounds; defines "park ground or playgrounds" to mean in, or within any building or structure or any fields, lands or grounds owned, leased or maintained by the state, any agency or municipality thereof, etc., for the purposes of recreation or leisure.
Title
Adds "park grounds and playgrounds" to statute currently providing increased penalties for sale of controlled substances to certain persons if such sale occurs on or within 1,000 feet of school grounds; defines "park ground or playgrounds" to mean in, or within any building or structure or any fields, lands or grounds owned, leased or maintained by the state, any agency or municipality thereof, etc., for the purposes of recreation or leisure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.575 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.632 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2173A |
2013-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02443 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes