NY S02114 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the $250 amount of damage from cemetery desecration in the second degree; makes cemetery desecration in the second degree a class E felony to apply to any damage or theft regardless of value; adds crime of cemetery desecration in the first degree and makes such crime a class D felony.
Title
Removes the $250 amount of damage from cemetery desecration in the second degree; makes cemetery desecration in the second degree a class E felony to apply to any damage or theft regardless of value; adds crime of cemetery desecration in the first degree and makes such crime a class D felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.755 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00217 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes