NY S02101 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2101A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2101A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county clerks to retain a portion of fees collected for motor vehicle related service fees and requires the commissioner to remit such fees to the county clerks on a quarterly basis.
Title
Authorizes county clerks to retain a portion of fees collected for motor vehicle related service fees and requires the commissioner to remit such fees to the county clerks on a quarterly basis.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2101A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1414 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |