NY S02079 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food service establishments to permit the use of reusable beverage and food containers provided by customers when requesting a beverage refill or requesting leftovers from a partially consumed meal to be packaged and post signs to inform customers that they are permitted to do so.
Title
Requires food service establishments to permit the use of reusable beverage and food containers provided by customers when requesting a beverage refill or requesting leftovers from a partially consumed meal to be packaged and post signs to inform customers that they are permitted to do so.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.558 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1047 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04673 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health