NY S02078 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Ildefonso Romero's law" to establish the felony offenses of aggravated assault for the causation of serious physical injury to or death of, as the case may be, of any person, with intent to cause physical injury to such person or a third person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Ildefonso Romero's law" to establish the felony offenses of aggravated assault for the causation of serious physical injury to or death of, as the case may be, of any person, with intent to cause physical injury to such person or a third person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-02-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-02-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.78
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.654
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A01945 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback