NY A01945 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Ildefonso Romero's law" to establish the felony offenses of aggravated assault for the causation of serious physical injury to or death of, as the case may be, of any person, with intent to cause physical injury to such person or a third person.
Title
Enacts "Ildefonso Romero's law" to establish the felony offenses of aggravated assault for the causation of serious physical injury to or death of, as the case may be, of any person, with intent to cause physical injury to such person or a third person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02078 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - referred to codes