NY S02061 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties and/or cities to establish a plan for providing legal counsel to persons who are defendants or respondents in eviction, ejectment and foreclosure proceedings and who are financially unable to obtain counsel; eligible person is one whose gross individual income is not in excess of one hundred twenty-five percent of the federal income official poverty line; requires the state to match dollar for dollar the amount counties appropriate for their plans.
Title
Requires counties and/or cities to establish a plan for providing legal counsel to persons who are defendants or respondents in eviction, ejectment and foreclosure proceedings and who are financially unable to obtain counsel; eligible person is one whose gross individual income is not in excess of one hundred twenty-five percent of the federal income official poverty line; requires the state to match dollar for dollar the amount counties appropriate for their plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2061B |
2015-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2061A |
2015-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05457 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to judiciary