NY S02059 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1050A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1050A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a court-appointed special advocates program to aid the family court.
Title
Relates to establishing a court-appointed special advocates program to aid the family court.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1050A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2059A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-07 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.191 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.288 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01050 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.291