NY A01050 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-15)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing a court-appointed special advocates program to aid the family court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing a court-appointed special advocates program to aid the family court.

Sponsors

Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Sen. James Skoufis [D]
Asm. Andrew Goodell [R]Asm. Gary Finch [R]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Christopher Friend [R]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]
Asm. Frank Skartados [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Addie Jenne [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. William Barclay [R]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. Joseph Errigo [R]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01Senatesigned chap.291
2018-09-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.191
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2059A
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.215
2018-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.215
2018-06-14Assemblyreported
2018-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-23Assemblyprint number 1050a
2018-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-01-10Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02059 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1050A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01050
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01050A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01050&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1050#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback