NY S02013 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the independent budget office of the city of New York to obtain certain tax data for purposes of evaluation.
Title
Authorizes the independent budget office of the city of New York to obtain certain tax data for purposes of evaluation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.556 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.518 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A09574 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - referred to cities