NY S02012 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.619
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.619
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to surcharges for the installation or use of air conditioner units in housing accommodations subject to rent control.
Title
Relates to surcharges for the installation or use of air conditioner units in housing accommodations subject to rent control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.619 |
2022-11-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted for a992a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2012A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2022-03-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.453 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1088 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00992 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - substituted by s2012a