NY A00992 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s2012a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s2012a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to surcharges for the installation or use of air conditioner units in housing accommodations subject to rent control.
Title
Relates to surcharges for the installation or use of air conditioner units in housing accommodations subject to rent control.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s2012a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.285 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 992a |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02012 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.619