NY S02000 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging.
Title
Relates to the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.542 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2000B |
2020-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.490 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a4739a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1675 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2000A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04739 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES