NY S01958 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8092B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8092B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that workers shall not be punished or subjected to discipline by employers for lawful absences.
Title
Clarifies that workers shall not be punished or subjected to discipline by employers for lawful absences.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8092B |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1958A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.384 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.468 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08092 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - signed chap.604