NY S01944 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the real property actions and proceedings law, in relation to designating a party to accept service in the event a property becomes vacant during the foreclosure process.
Title
Amends the real property actions and proceedings law, in relation to designating a party to accept service in the event a property becomes vacant during the foreclosure process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-07-09 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1944A | |
2009-05-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-06 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-05 | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 | |
2009-02-10 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |