NY S01838 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalties for overtaking and passing a school bus; provides that for the first conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $350 nor more than $500; provides that for a second conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $500 nor more than $800; also provides that for a third conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $800 nor more than $1000.
Title
Increases the penalties for overtaking and passing a school bus; provides that for the first conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $350 nor more than $500; provides that for a second conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $500 nor more than $800; also provides that for a third conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $800 nor more than $1000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1419 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10636 (Same As) 2016-06-10 - referred to transportation