NY S01836 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the designation of low volume roads and minimum maintenance roads by town boards; enacts provisions relating to the maintenance, improvement and repair of such roads.
Title
Permits the designation of low volume roads and minimum maintenance roads by town boards; enacts provisions relating to the maintenance, improvement and repair of such roads.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Mark Walczyk [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2024-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.773 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1005 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02225 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation