NY S01831 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A354B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A354B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to polysomnographic technology services; grants authorization to practice polysomnographic technology to individuals who have met certain standards and requirements.
Title
Relates to polysomnographic technology services; grants authorization to practice polysomnographic technology to individuals who have met certain standards and requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A354B |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1378 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1831B |
2011-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2011-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1831A |
2011-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2011-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2011-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00354 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - signed chap.262