NY A00354 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to polysomnographic technology services; grants authorization to practice polysomnographic technology to individuals who have met certain standards and requirements.
Title
Relates to polysomnographic technology services; grants authorization to practice polysomnographic technology to individuals who have met certain standards and requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Senate | signed chap.262 |
2011-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1378 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1831B |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.263 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-06-03 | Assembly | print number 354b |
2011-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2011-06-03 | Assembly | print number 354a |
2011-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01831 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A354B