NY S01817 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the display of a bus driver's credentials prominently while he or she is on duty and changes the review of his or her files by the department from every three years to annually.
Title
Requires the display of a bus driver's credentials prominently while he or she is on duty and changes the review of his or her files by the department from every three years to annually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.268 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01838 (Same As) 2024-01-17 - REFERRED TO CODES