NY S01816 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to duration of orders of protection in cases involving domestic violence.
Title
Relates to duration of orders of protection in cases involving domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.337 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.475 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01385 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to judiciary