NY S01789 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that whenever rent is paid by NYC human resources administration on behalf of a tenant on public assistance, the department of housing preservation shall send a certification of payment to such tenant.
Title
Provides that whenever rent is paid by NYC human resources administration on behalf of a tenant on public assistance, the department of housing preservation shall send a certification of payment to such tenant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.308 |
2017-09-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.192 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8166a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1752 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1789A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08166 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s1789a