NY S01780 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing for electronic notarization; authorizes the use of video and audio conference technology in identifying individuals for electronic notarization.
Title
Relates to providing for electronic notarization; authorizes the use of video and audio conference technology in identifying individuals for electronic notarization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.128 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.767 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.654 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a399b |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1780C |
2021-05-24 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1780B |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | AMENDED 1780A |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.458 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00399 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s1780c