NY S01751 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1751A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1751A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the public service commission to require that gas and electric corporations establish a rate classification for volunteer emergency response organizations which shall not be greater than the rate for veterans' organizations.
Title
Relates to directing the public service commission to require that gas and electric corporations establish a rate classification for volunteer emergency response organizations which shall not be greater than the rate for veterans' organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1751A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07118 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - print number 7118a