NY A07118 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 7118a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 7118a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the public service commission to require that gas and electric corporations establish a rate classification for volunteer emergency response organizations which shall not be greater than the rate for veterans' organizations.
Title
Relates to directing the public service commission to require that gas and electric corporations establish a rate classification for volunteer emergency response organizations which shall not be greater than the rate for veterans' organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | print number 7118a |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01751 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1751A