NY S01744 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to discounted tolls on the Verrazano-Narrows bridge for residents of Kings county.
Title
Relates to discounted tolls on the Verrazano-Narrows bridge for residents of Kings county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1534 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1406 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01914 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions