NY S01714 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases local government participation in the Empire Plan Prescription Drug Plan.
Title
Increases local government participation in the Empire Plan Prescription Drug Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.160 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.269 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10239 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - referred to governmental employees