NY S01694 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6253A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6253A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state grid modernization commission; provides the commission shall conduct a study of research, development and demonstrations of electric grid modernization and shall issue such report to the state energy planning board for consideration in the state energy plan.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state grid modernization commission; provides the commission shall conduct a study of research, development and demonstrations of electric grid modernization and shall issue such report to the state energy planning board for consideration in the state energy plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6253A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1469 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1694B |
2024-05-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-02-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1694A |
2024-02-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06253 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY