NY A06253 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing the New York state grid modernization commission; provides the commission shall conduct a study of research, development and demonstrations of electric grid modernization and shall issue such report to the state energy planning board for consideration in the state energy plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing the New York state grid modernization commission; provides the commission shall conduct a study of research, development and demonstrations of electric grid modernization and shall issue such report to the state energy planning board for consideration in the state energy plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-22Assemblytabled
2024-11-22Assemblyvetoed memo.34
2024-11-15Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.1469
2024-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1694B
2024-05-28SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2024-05-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-05-28Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-16Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 6253a
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.177
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.640
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.640
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S01694 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6253A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6253
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06253&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06253
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06253&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06253A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06253&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06253&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06253&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06253&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6253#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback