NY S01659 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases certain amounts of payments wrongfully received that would trigger higher degrees of the crime of health care fraud.
Title
Decreases certain amounts of payments wrongfully received that would trigger higher degrees of the crime of health care fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.765 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |