NY S01653 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Haverstraw, county of Rockland, to accept from Hi Tor Animal Care Center, Inc. an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Haverstraw, county of Rockland, to accept from Hi Tor Animal Care Center, Inc. an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.296 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.329 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a1877 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.378 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01877 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.296