NY S01634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force on disasters to examine how insurers who write policies that cover loss of or damage to real property, personal property or other liabilities for loss of, damage to, or injury to persons or property in the state respond to disasters.
Title
Creates a task force on disasters to examine how insurers who write policies that cover loss of or damage to real property, personal property or other liabilities for loss of, damage to, or injury to persons or property in the state respond to disasters.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.255 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.406 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7830 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.22 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07830 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.255