NY S01579 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1579A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1579A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Title
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1579A |
2014-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01836 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS