NY A01836 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Title
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.101 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.82 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | print number 1836a |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01579 (Same As) 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1579A
S06872 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S06872 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS