NY S01576 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the method of payment on delinquent real property taxes, sewer rents, sewer surcharges, water rents, or any other charges that are made a lien; requires cash, debit card, credit card, certified check or money order.
Title
Relates to the method of payment on delinquent real property taxes, sewer rents, sewer surcharges, water rents, or any other charges that are made a lien; requires cash, debit card, credit card, certified check or money order.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2018-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.537 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1576A |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.391 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01186 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken