NY S01557 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the requirements in absentee ballot applications for village elections to conform to state board of election absentee ballot requirements.
Title
Provides for the requirements in absentee ballot applications for village elections to conform to state board of election absentee ballot requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-05 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2011-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03685 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS