NY S01527 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1527C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1527C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; relates to the description of cannabis, and the growing of and use of cannabis by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of cannabis; relates to removing certain references to marijuana relating to forfeiture actions; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving cannabis and exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of cannabis; relates to the definition of smoking; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; levies an excise tax on certain sales of cannabis; repeals certain provisions of the penal law relating to the criminal sale of cannabis and provisions of the general business law relating to drug paraphernalia; creates the New York state cannabis revenue fund, the New York state drug treatment and public education fund and the New York state community grants reinvestment fund.
Title
Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; relates to the description of cannabis, and the growing of and use of cannabis by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of cannabis; relates to removing certain references to marijuana relating to forfeiture actions; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving cannabis and exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of cannabis; relates to the definition of smoking; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; levies an excise tax on certain sales of cannabis; repeals certain provisions of the penal law relating to the criminal sale of cannabis and provisions of the general business law relating to drug paraphernalia; creates the New York state cannabis revenue fund, the New York state drug treatment and public education fund and the New York state community grants reinvestment fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1527C |
2020-03-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1527B |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1527A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01617 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - print number 1617c