NY S01492 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires 10% of the penalties imposed by the superintendent of financial services to be deposited in the community development financial institution fund.
Title
Requires 10% of the penalties imposed by the superintendent of financial services to be deposited in the community development financial institution fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2023-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A01509 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to banks