NY S01491 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the creation of a drug guide for seniors regarding the drugs commonly used by people over 62 years of age; provides that such guide will include functions and drug interactions.
Title
Provides for the creation of a drug guide for seniors regarding the drugs commonly used by people over 62 years of age; provides that such guide will include functions and drug interactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.357 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A05033 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to aging