NY S01471 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1471A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1471A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education and the commissioner of general services to promulgate standards for the procurement and use of environmentally sensitive commodities and services for schools and boards of cooperative educational services; provides that these provisions shall be applicable to all school districts and boards of cooperative educational services.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education and the commissioner of general services to promulgate standards for the procurement and use of environmentally sensitive commodities and services for schools and boards of cooperative educational services; provides that these provisions shall be applicable to all school districts and boards of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Cecilia Tkaczyk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1471A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04640 (Same As) 2014-01-22 - print number 4640a