NY S01464 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the crime of aggravated murder involving certain business owners.
Title
Relates to the crime of aggravated murder involving certain business owners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-03-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01417 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes