NY S01451 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a health equity assessment to be filed with an application for construction, or substantial reduction of, a hospital or health related service; includes a demonstration of whether and how a project will improve or affect access to hospital services and health care with particular reference to members of medically underserved groups in the applicant's service area.
Title
Requires a health equity assessment to be filed with an application for construction, or substantial reduction of, a hospital or health related service; includes a demonstration of whether and how a project will improve or affect access to hospital services and health care with particular reference to members of medically underserved groups in the applicant's service area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.127 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.766 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.88 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a191a |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1451A |
2021-04-26 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | recommitted to health |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | substitution reconsidered |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.88 |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | substituted for a191 |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.110 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00191 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - substituted by s1451