NY S01386 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the taking of wildlife by the use of a crossbow; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes the taking of wildlife by the use of a crossbow; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.857 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1386A |
2017-03-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00479 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation