NY S01365 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of agriculture and markets to increase the number of regional farmers' markets for the direct marketing of foods and produce produced in the state.
Title
Directs the department of agriculture and markets to increase the number of regional farmers' markets for the direct marketing of foods and produce produced in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2024-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.229 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.229 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2023-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.209 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |