NY S01341 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to reconvey its interest in certain real property acquired by in rem tax foreclosure in the borough of Brooklyn to former owner Chester Wilkins, notwithstanding expiration of the two year period within which application may be made to the city to release its interest in property thus acquired; Block No. 1651, Lot No. 52 on tax map for the borough of Brooklyn.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to reconvey its interest in certain real property acquired by in rem tax foreclosure in the borough of Brooklyn to former owner Chester Wilkins, notwithstanding expiration of the two year period within which application may be made to the city to release its interest in property thus acquired; Block No. 1651, Lot No. 52 on tax map for the borough of Brooklyn.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CITIES | |
2009-09-23 | PRINT NUMBER 1341B | |
2009-09-23 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES | |
2009-06-11 | PRINT NUMBER 1341A | |
2009-06-11 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES | |
2009-01-28 | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03753 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to cities